Financial history SAVE THE MOTHERS TRUST (SMT)

Charity number: 1104771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £631.87k £660.52k £740.44k £851.17k £612.69k
Total expenditure £557.66k £573.52k £700.92k £764.06k £658.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £48.67k £58.06k £41.57k £54.86k
Income - Donations and legacies £520.22k £542.60k £709.83k £756.57k £594.88k
Income - Other trading activities £109.87k £115.37k £30.25k £88.06k £17.64k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £914 £394 £42 £316 £0
Income - Other £866 £2.15k £310 £6.22k £173
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £446.84k £500.32k £616.84k £720.32k £614.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds £110.82k £72.77k £82.29k £42.86k £42.61k
Expenditure - Governance £1.27k £242 £706 £4.60k £2.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £69.92k £83.50k £279.28k £485.23k £377.45k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £25.05k £21.22k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £433 £1.79k £882 £1.39k