THE INCOGNITO THEATRE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity leases its own well equipped 64 seat theatre and aims to make high quality live theatre accessible to local actors, back-stage crew, technicians, directors, designers, writers and audiences and so enrich their lives and benefit the community generally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
84 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Enfield
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julianne Mullen | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Groom | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Sly | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Susan Johnson | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Gale Lomas | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Mason | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|||||
JOHN DAVID SAVAGE | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
HUW MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.17k | £27.03k | £4.49k | £24.76k | £32.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.62k | £19.36k | £7.92k | £18.11k | £32.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUL 2021 as amended on 21 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND ENTERTAIN THE PUBLIC IN THE THEATRICAL ARTS; TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRCATICE FRIERN BARNET, NEW SOUTHGATE AND HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Incognito Theatre
106A Holly Park Road
LONDON
N11 3HB
- Phone:
- 07912875700
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window