WEBPLAY (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WEBPLAY IS AN ARTS-EDUCATION CHARITY THAT COMBINES DRAMA AND TECHNOLOGY TO CREATE PROJECTS FOR SCHOOLS THAT RAISE CHILDRENS' ASPIRATIONS, SKILLS, CREATIVITY AND CROSS-CULTURAL UNDERSTANDING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 April 2004: Standard registration
- 02 October 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 30/11/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £616.82k | £461.21k | £328.97k | £189.90k | £180.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £543.49k | £463.64k | £350.74k | £193.86k | £197.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £381.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £235.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £526.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2011 | 25 November 2012 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2011 | 30 April 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 11 DECEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE ART OF THEATRE AND PERFORMANCE THROUGH, IN PARTICULAR, (A) THE PROVISION OF INTERNET-BASED PROJECTS ENABLING PRIMARY SCHOOL CHILDREN TO CREATE, PRODUCE AND PERFORM PLAYS AND TO LEARN ABOUT THEATRE (B) INTERACTION AND COLLABORATION WITH THEATRE PROFESSIONALS AND THEATRE COMPANIES (C) PARTICIPATION IN SUCH PROJECTS BY CHILDREN RESIDENT IN DIFFERENT PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN DIFFERENT COUNTRIES, THEREBY PROMOTING COMMUNICATION AND COLLABORATION BETWEEN CHILDREN OF DIFFERENT BACKGROUNDS AND CULTURES (D) COMBINING TECHNOLOGY AND THE ARTS TO ENHANCE OVERALL CLASSROOM TEACHING AND LEARNING AND TO DEVELOP PUPIL SKILL DEVELOPMENT 2. TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN RELATION TO EDUCATION AND THE ARTS AS TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window