GALICIA JEWISH HERITAGE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1102095
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and Training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Total income: £129,399
Total expenditure: £133,425
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
- Poland
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 February 2004: Standard registration
- 15 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.80k | £69.75k | £140.83k | £153.89k | £129.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.36k | £20.85k | £135.67k | £130.54k | £133.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 15 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 15 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 03 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 03 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 28 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 28 October 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN THE UK AND ABROAD
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window