THE STANLEY GRUNDY FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are the promotion and advancement of such charitable bodies, associations and trusts in such shares and in such manner in all respects as the Trustees may in their absolute discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN CHRISTINE GREENHILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Arabella Susie Lofts | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas Matthew Holmes | Trustee | 25 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD CARNELL | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DIANE MARGARET HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.83k | £78.39k | £69.64k | £72.77k | £82.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.63k | £88.28k | £127.78k | £111.03k | £113.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 FEBRUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES ASSOCIATIONS AND TRUSTS IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Garden Flat
37 Redington Road
Hampstead
London
NW3 7QY
- Phone:
- 02074357905
- Email:
- admin@grundyfoundation.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window