Accounts and annual returns ALL NATIONS PENTECOSTAL CHURCH UK
Charity number: 1102374

Charity reporting is overdue by 1473 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days | |
Annual return | 27 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days | |
Annual return | 27 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 743 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 743 days | |
Annual return | 27 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1108 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1108 days | |
Annual return | 27 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1473 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window