THE BRITISH PAIN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Pain Society aims to promote education, training, research and development in all fields of pain. It endeavours to increase both professional and public awareness of the prevalence of pain and the facilities that are available for its management.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Roger David Knaggs | Chair | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Harrisson | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Iain Stuart Richardson Jones | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manojit Sinha | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Mary Price | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rajesh Munglani | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mahindra Chincholkar | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sumit Gulati | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Stephen Hey | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Pang | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ramanarayanan Krishnamoorthy | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Talbert Collighan | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £510.42k | £396.47k | £311.26k | £276.24k | £235.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £539.28k | £280.77k | £297.91k | £274.71k | £249.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £154.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £108.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £244.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £496.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £21.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £24.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £42.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 MAY 2016 as amended on 02 May 2019 as amended on 29 Sep 2020 as amended on 30 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY RAISING THE STANDARD OF THE MANAGEMENT OF PAIN BY PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRITISH PAIN SOCIETY
CHURCHILL HOUSE
35 RED LION SQUARE
LONDON
WC1R 4SG
- Phone:
- 02072697840
- Email:
- info@britishpainsociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window