JAMIA MASJID & MADRASSA FAIZ UL QURAN GHOUSIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the charity is to provide a place of worship, religious teachings and education centre for the benefit of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 February 2004: Standard registration
- MADRASSA FAIZ-UL-QURAN GHOUSIA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED YASSIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AJAZ AHMED | Trustee | 09 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Yaseen | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAMRAN ASGHAR | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL G Rehman | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Razaq | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED SALEEM | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL KHALIQ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.81k | £74.64k | £97.61k | £92.63k | £105.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.72k | £63.71k | £93.79k | £62.40k | £83.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 27/08/2004 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE TRUST ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE SUNNI BAREILVI SCHOOL OF SHAH AHMED RAZA KHAN SHEIKH ABDUL HAQ MUHADDITH DELHAVI, HAZRAT SYED PIR MEHR ALI SHAH GOLARVI, (MAY BLESSING OF ALLAH BE UPON THEM) AS GUIDES AND BELIEVING IN THEIR INTERPRETATION OF THE ISLAMIC TEACHING RESIDENT IN THE STECHFORD AREA OF BIRMINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE AND IN PARTICULAR: I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SUNNI BRELVI MUSLIM FAITH ONLY; II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING INSTRUCTIONS IN THE SUNNI - BRELVI MUSLIM FAITH); III) THE RELIEF OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN, WOMEN AND CHILDREN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. IV) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES. V) TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
STECHFORD, BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
173-175 Albert Road
Stechford
Birmingham
B33 8UB
- Phone:
- 07968794080
- Email:
- mr.yasin@aol.co.uk
- Website:
-
stechfordmosque.org.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window