Accounts and annual returns THE WOMEN'S EMPOWERMENT PROJECT

Charity number: 1102384
Charity reporting is overdue by 1800 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 339 days
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 339 days
Annual return 01 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 705 days
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 705 days
Annual return 01 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1070 days
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1070 days
Annual return 01 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1435 days
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1435 days
Annual return 01 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1800 days
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1800 days