WEST HUNTSPILL SCHOOL UNDER FIVES GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a playgroup.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £2,242 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 17 May 2004: Standard registration
- 09 January 2023: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.11k | £52.24k | £60.21k | £49.72k | £50.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.26k | £48.55k | £56.81k | £58.59k | £43.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £40.28k | £48.43k | N/A | £40.97k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE IN WEST HUNTSPILL, SOMERSET.
Area of benefit
WEST HUNTSPILL, SOMERSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window