Accounts and annual returns SPRATTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1106319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 April 2023 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 October 2022 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required