THE EDUCATORS TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports and encourages the work of educators in all educational sectors; sponsors talks and events which highlight matters of interest and concern to those involved in education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 June 2004: Standard registration
- 11 December 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1179353 THE EDUCATORS TRUST
- THE GUILD OF EDUCATORS TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.06k | £13.50k | £22.74k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.33k | £16.33k | £14.25k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 February 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 05/01/04 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13/05/04 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/14
Charitable objects
(I) TO REWARD EXCELLENCE AND INNOVATION IN THEIR ACHIEVEMENT AND TRAINING IN ORDER TO ENCOURAGE BOTH STUDENTS AND THEIR MENTORS TO UNDERTAKE, AND THE PUBLIC TO APPRECIATE, THE WORK OF EDUCATORS. (II) TO PROMOTE, BY THE AWARD OF BURSARIES AND GRANTS AND OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS, THE DEVELOPMENT OF EDUCATORS THROUGH RESEARCH AND STUDY THAT IS APPROPRIATE TO THE PROFESSION OF EDUCATOR AND THAT INCREASES UNDERSTANDING OF RELEVANT OPPORTUNITIES AND NEEDS. (III) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO EDUCATION AND ITS DELIVERY THROUGH PROMOTION OF PUBLIC PRESENTATIONS AND DISCUSSIONS OF RELEVANT DEVELOPMENTS; AND THE GENERATION OF REPORTS TO POLICY MAKING BODIES AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window