Financial history THE JOHN APTHORP CHARITY

Charity number: 1102472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £547.27k £360.94k £381.23k £475.07k £377.93k
Total expenditure £817.71k £284.04k £253.20k £338.97k £395.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £547.27k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £817.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £111 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.64k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £811.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £111 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A