HAZEL GROVE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stockport
Governance
- 01 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 06 December 2023: Funds received from 1152310 INTENTIONAL HEALTH
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Uchenna Okoye | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Sylvia Babcock | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Chisholm | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian James Needham | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BAKER | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Catherine Joanne Mackay | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Denise Edge | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Simon Paddon | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN JOSEPH BULMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
NIGEL BRUCE TEDFORD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.77k | £245.91k | £253.15k | £290.59k | £300.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.42k | £231.58k | £271.75k | £311.52k | £290.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 2009 as amended on 15 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAZEL GROVE BAPTIST CHURCH
STATION STREET
HAZEL GROVE
STOCKPORT
SK7 4EX
- Phone:
- 01614873708
- Email:
- OFFICE@HGBC.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window