SACRED HEART CATHOLIC COLLEGE PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parent/Teachers Association raising funds for the School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sefton
Governance
- 20 February 2004: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 February 2010: Standard registration
- SACRED HEART PTA (Working name)
- SACRED HEART HIGH SCHOOL CROSBY PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne McKenna | Chair | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Calvillo Antrobus | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.80k | £1.14k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £117 | £117 | £123 | £123 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 April 2021 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED 11 JANUARY 2011 AND 4 OCTOBER 2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL OR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE, SEFTON, MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Harrington Road
Crosby
LIVERPOOL
L23 5ST
- Phone:
- 01519312971
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window