TABITHA FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1102500
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TABITHA FOUNDATION UK RAISES FUNDS FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT IN CAMBODIA. WE ACCEPT DONATIONS TO FUND PROGRAMS SUCH AS HOUSE-BUILDING, COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, WELL CONSTRUCTION, AND A WOMENS HOSPITAL. WE ALSO SUPPORT CAMBODIAN COTTAGE INDUSTRY AND ASSIST GROUPS WHO WISH TO BUILD HOUSES IN CAMBODIA BOTH IN LOGISTICS COORDINATION AS WELL AS WIRING FUNDS TO CAMBODIA.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022

Total income: £42,200
Total expenditure: £38,555

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambodia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 March 2004: Standard registration
  • 06 April 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TABITHA UK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £76.28k £91.07k £55.47k £44.78k £42.20k
Total expenditure £64.17k £102.60k £54.98k £48.38k £38.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 14 February 2020 On Time