Financial history THE CAPTAIN FRENCH TRUST

Charity number: 1103254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.94k £0 £0 £500 £231
Total expenditure £1.53k £0 £0 £373 £342
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A