CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH (VICTORY CENTRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CAC Victory Centre vision is to nurture and equip an assembly of believers through the ministry of the Word of God. The activities include Youths' fellowship, Counselling, Evangelistic Outreach, Music Rehearsals. Main Meetings: Wednesday: Bible Study/ Counselling @7.30pm. 1st & 3rd Fridays Breakthrough Service- 7.30pm Sunday Service @ 1.00-3.30pm. c/o St James Church, New Cross Gate SE14 6AD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
- France
- Nigeria
Governance
- 05 March 2004: Standard registration
- CAC VICTORY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR PETER OGUNTIMEHIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DR Joel Popoola Ajayi | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.58k | £41.61k | £49.01k | £89.93k | £50.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.44k | £32.88k | £43.34k | £57.07k | £52.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST AN PROCLAIMING THE KINGDOM OF GOD THROUGH PREACHING THE WORD OF GOD, LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, PRAYERS AND DISTRIBUTION OF GOSPEL TRACTS, AND BY ENDURING SPIRITUAL GROWTH OF MEMBERS AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO LIVE A LIFE OF RIGHTEOUS, HOLINESS AND PREVAILING PRAYER. 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS BY PROVIDING CARE FOR THE NEEDY AND BY CO-OPERATING WITH OTHER CHARITABLE AND CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS TO OFFER HELP BOTH FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE TO VICTIMS OF WAR, DISASTER AND OTHER MISFORTUNES BOTH NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Area of benefit
BERMONDSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 LAMBSCROFT AVENUE
LONDON
SE9 4PB
- Phone:
- 07951474380
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window