FRIENDS OF BABRAHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1102190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School Fundraising for school (educational purposes)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £5,923
Total expenditure: £7,558

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Julian Few Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Anna Cheung Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Dr Erika MORIZZO Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.76k £1.99k £7.20k £9.63k £5.92k
Total expenditure £860 £2.04k £6.22k £5.44k £7.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 18 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 20 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 10 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BABRAHAM C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
HIGH STREET
BABRAHAM
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 3AG
Phone:
01223832322
Website:

No information available