UCKFIELD AND DISTRICT PRESERVATION SOCIETY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Society for the preservation of old buildings, currently Nutley Windmill and a Medieval Wealden Hall House, Bridge Cottage in the south end of Uckfield High Street, and the production of publications and exhibitions to promote interest and appreciation of the local heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 10 March 2004: Standard registration
- Uckfield Heritage (Working name)
- UDPS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM BRIAN TERENCE PIKE | Chair | 07 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR A LEDWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR PIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR HARKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.76k | £38.61k | £64.00k | £23.77k | £36.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.97k | £37.23k | £46.25k | £39.37k | £36.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £10.00k | £26.04k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 February 2021 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 February 2021 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JUNE 2002.
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF NUTLEY WINDMILL AND ITS BEING KEPT OPEN TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE BY CHARITABLE MEANS IN THE NORTHERN HALF OF THE WEALDEN DISTRICT COUNCIL AREA:- PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE LOCALITY; PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST; HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING.
Area of benefit
NORTHERN HALF WEALDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bridge Cottage
High Street
UCKFIELD
East Sussex
TN22 1AZ
- Phone:
- 01825760734
- Email:
- info@udps.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window