BEDFORD COUNCIL OF FAITHS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities aim to build good relations and encourage understanding between people of different faiths and beliefs. We advise individuals and organisations on matters of faith, and promote shared action on social issues. We visit places of worship, hold lectures, mount exhibitions and hold social events, and are represented on local community groups, government bodies and faith agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 15 July 2004: Standard registration
- BCOF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Virendra Soni | Chair | 29 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Tarsem Lal Paul | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Richard Rashid Rogers | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Dr Vijay Krishan Nayar | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tirath Singh Bhavra | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Chiara Mitchell-Middleton | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter Gerrish | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Sandra Howes | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
DR WENDI MOMEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £507 | £240 | £70 | £195 | £266 | |
|
Total expenditure | £189 | £341 | £134 | £423 | £351 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 2000, AS AMENDED 8 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED ON 23 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN BEDFORD AND ENVIRONS BY: -PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. -ADVANCING EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS.EAVEMENT COUNSELLORS
Area of benefit
BEDFORD AND ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
WIXAMTREE
SAND LANE
NORTHILL
BIGGLESWADE
BEDS.
SG18 9AD
- Phone:
- 01767627626
- Email:
- bcof@momen.plus.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window