BACKSTREET THEATRE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR CURRENT ACTIVITIES INCLUDE PERFORMING SHOWS/PANTOMIMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 07 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELLIE SKELTON | Chair | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Watson | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne BROWN Mrs | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA RULE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.32k | £2.30k | £1.59k | £3.98k | £5.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.42k | £1.74k | £3.18k | £4.24k | £6.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 February 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 1 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL OR LEARNING DISABILITIES, IN PARTICULAR BY INVOLVING THEM IN CREATION, ORGANISATION AND PERFORMANCE OF THEATRICAL PRODUCTIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRANGETOWN YOUTH & COMMUNITY CENTRE
GRANGE FARM ROAD
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS6 7HP
- Phone:
- 07909906480
- Email:
- backstreet.tc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window