PASTON RIDINGS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to provide activities and fund raising events for the benefit of all stakeholders and the extended community of Paston Ridings Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 20 February 2004: Standard registration
- PASTON RIDINGS PTFA (Working name)
- PRPSPTFA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA HARRADINE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 363 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 363 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 23 March 2021 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY: A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE PARENTS, STAFF AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF PASTON RIDINGS PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paston Ridings Primary School
Paston Ridings
PETERBOROUGH
PE4 7XG
- Phone:
- 01733762742
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window