AFRICAN LEADERSHIP INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1104688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Its objects are to advance the education of the general public by promoting leadership and the training of effective leaders in Africa and in particular to encourage and support individuals in Africa who are or wish to be in positions of leadership to learn and develop their skills and to promote research into leadership and the public disseminationof the useful results thereon.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £246,314
Total expenditure: £298,370

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey
  • Kenya
  • South Africa
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Isaac Kwaku Fokuo Jr Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Kunyalala Maphisa Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
MARTIN LAWRENCE KINGSTON Trustee 24 January 2025
CG PHILANTHROPIES
Received: On time
DR Allen Zimbler Trustee 01 July 2016
HYDE PARK ESTATE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SEAN PATRICK LANCE Trustee
None on record
JOHN MALCOLM TRAVERS GREENSMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £90.12k £122.16k £98.97k £266.34k £246.31k
Total expenditure £174.58k £83.97k £76.92k £238.46k £298.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 November 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 November 2020 19 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HILLCREST
GUILDFORD ROAD
OTTERSHAW
CHERTSEY
KT16 0QL
Phone:
01932872358