Trustees CENTRE FOR PEACEBUILDING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Charity number: 1105864

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIET ANNE SCHOFIELD | Chair | 25 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
Angelina Biriukova | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Dunmore | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Michael Peacock | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brilliant Chilaeva | Trustee | 29 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL GILLIES | Trustee | 01 February 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.