COPELAND AMATEUR SWIMMING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of swimming tuition and coaching which will enable swimmers to achieve their full potential in self progression and compete in regional and national competitions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 17 May 2004: Standard registration
- COPELAND ASC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Sutton | Chair | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Collins | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Payne | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Goddard | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Todhunter | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Holiday | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Allyson Quayle | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Quayle | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.64k | £48.15k | £31.52k | £60.19k | £76.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.27k | £52.51k | £30.91k | £66.17k | £78.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.62k | £871 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 7 APRIL 2004 as amended on 04 Jan 2021 as amended on 04 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE WHO NEED IT FOR THEM TO TAKE PART IN THE SPORT OF SWIMMING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Ellen Drive
WHITEHAVEN
Cumbria
CA28 9DH
- Phone:
- 07739813947
- Email:
- markholliday1979@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window