Financial history THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF ZICHRON MENACHEM

Charity number: 1102612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £296.39k £151.02k £119.66k £141.50k £156.91k
Total expenditure £398.49k £84.61k £231.37k £71.69k £92.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.33k £1.33k N/A N/A