TEST VALLEY PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Test Valley School PTA is to advance the education of the pupils in the school. This is done through fundraising to provide facilities, equipment and opportunities for the children and holding social events to develop relationships between staff, pupils, parents and others in the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Hampshire
Governance
- 23 February 2004: Standard registration
- TEST VALLEY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- TEST VALLEY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth lane | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
sam perrett | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Donohue | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.46k | £4.75k | £5.31k | £4.10k | £3.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.25k | £2.19k | £3.32k | £2.19k | £5.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 September 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 March 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY:~ A) DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. C) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES OR ITEMS OF EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDS) AS THE COMMITTEE IN CONSULTATION WITH THE GOVERNING BODY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Test Valley School
Roman Road
STOCKBRIDGE
SO20 6HA
- Phone:
- 01264 810555
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window