FRIENDS OF JUBILEE HOUSE GODALMING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have been supporting the residents of Jubilee House by providing extra activities and outings. In 2009/10 we provided 16 activities including a River Trip, a visit by a farm, Punch and Judy show and musical entertainment. We raised funds in this year by sellng homemade jams and chutneys, car boot sales and collection boxes. Around 30 of the 48 residents of the nursing home benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 April 2004: Standard registration
- 24 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.56k | £1.80k | £4.02k | £7.91k | £950 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.75k | £2.68k | £6.17k | £4.29k | £1.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 OCTOBER 2003.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ALZHEIMER'S PATIENTS, LIVING IN THE GODALMING AREA, WITH PARTICULAR CONCERN FOR THOSE RESIDENT IN JUBILEE HOUSE POUND LANE, GODALMING. THE RELIEF OF OTHER RESIDENTS OF JUBILEE HOUSE POUND LANE, GODALMING, SUFFERING FROM DEMENTIA OR OTHER MENTAL ILLNESS, WHETHER OR NOT THEIR RESIDENCE IS PERMANENT OR TEMPORARY. THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO EASE BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SUFFERING OF THE ABOVE PERSONS, OR TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF THEIR LIFE.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF GODALMING, SURREY. IN PARTICULAR THOSE RESIDENT IN JUBILEE HOUSE, POUND LANE, GODALMING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window