CLUB BANA YOLO (CBY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
Governance
- 12 May 2004: Standard registration
- 09 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.49k | £2.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.42k | £2.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 16 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE FROM THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO (BRAZZAVILLE), ANGOLA AND OTHER LINGALA SPEAKERS LIVING IN LONDON BY: I THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH; II THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; III THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON MATTERS RELATING TO HIV, HOUSING, WELFARE BENEFIT, TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETING SERVICES, CHILDCARE, IMMIGRATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT (INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT) AND IV TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, DISABILITY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window