HEADWAY SOUTH BUCKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The rehabilitation and care of persons who have suffered brain injuries and who reside in South Buckinghamshire and adjoining counties through the provision of such services and facilities as are required from time to time for the rehabilitation and relief of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,816 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 08 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE CLARKE | Chair | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Lady Julia Katrin Hughes-Morgan | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Phil Grover | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samatha Gault | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.62k | £111.14k | £80.70k | £88.46k | £74.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.67k | £63.75k | £54.85k | £77.05k | £80.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.10k | N/A | £27.00k | £10.40k | £10.82k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £27.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE REHABILITATION AND CARE OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED BRAIN INJURY AND RESIDE IN SOUTH BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND ADJOINING COUNTIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUCH SERVICES AND FACILITIES AS ARE REQUIRED FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE REHABILITATION AND RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AERAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Registered Office: Cansdales Ltd
St. Marys Court
The Broadway
AMERSHAM
Buckinghamshire
HP7 0UT
- Phone:
- 07704860754
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window