ABIDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
no activities over past yeaqr due to illness
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 11 June 2004: Standard registration
- 17 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY DEDICATED ENVIRONMENT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2005 | 30/04/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.38k | £115 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY, PARTICULARLY YOUNG PERSONS (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH PROVIDING A HOME, REHABILITATION AND COUNSELLING TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO LIVE AN INDEPENDENT AND SUPPORTED LIFE); AND (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES OF, AND TREATMENT FOR, ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY AND THE PROBLEMS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CARDIFF AND SOUTH WALES (INITIALLY).
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window