Financial history HAJI SULEMAN AND AMINA JIVA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1103812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £600 £1.72k £3.06k £1.50k £1.54k
Total expenditure £1.92k £2.02k £4.12k £1.00k £1.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A