Governing document THE ARTS SOCIETY ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 1993 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED ON 04 JUL 2018 as amended on 07 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, THE CULTIVATION, APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS, AND THE GIVING OF AID FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE TO THE CONSERVATION OF OUR NATIONAL ARTISTIC HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN ADDITION, SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS:
Area of benefit
LEAMINGTON SPA, WARWICK, COVENTRY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.