Trustees THE ARTS SOCIETY ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA
Charity number: 1102548

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Keith Roberts | Chair | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynne Henderson | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Catherine Love | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Barton | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hornbrook | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Barton | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Rosemary Dunnett | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margot Radomska | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Crampton | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eithne Batt | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edwina McConville | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.