Financial history WELSH RUGBY INTERNATIONAL PLAYERS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1102484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £16.39k £27.58k £127 £5.10k £3.94k
Total expenditure £20.63k £12.86k £4.06k £5.47k £83
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A