PHOENIX-AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
phoenix aid operates in Bosnia Herzegovina, providing a range of healthcare training techniques to schools, hospitals and war victims and disabled associations. We also provide general help and training in other skills where applicable, and work to promote employment opportunities wherever possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Kosovo
Governance
- 25 May 2004: Standard registration
- 21 May 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.43k | £2.67k | £2.84k | £1.34k | £895 | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.61k | £1.41k | £1.78k | £690 | £1.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 5 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT PRIMARILY BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION IN BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND JOB OPPORTUNITIES WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON PROVIDING ACCESS FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE BY REASON OF SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE FOLLOWING POST WAR CONFLICT ARE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO GAIN SUCH ACCESS.
Area of benefit
BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window