AFGHAN HUMANITARIAN SOCIAL AND CULTURAL CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 05 August 2004: Standard registration
- 22 September 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- AFGHAN COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APRIL 2004, AS AMENDED 24 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF AFGHAN PEOPLE IN THE UK AND AFGHANISTAN. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AFGHAN PEOPLE IN THE UK AND AFGHANISTAN BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UK AND AFGHANISTAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window