Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL WEST OF ENGLAND ACADEMY

Charity number: 1107149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.05k £29.65k £33.72k £41.64k £51.31k
Total expenditure £29.26k £26.31k £35.89k £40.71k £50.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A