MARY SEACOLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public on the life, work and achievements of Mary Seacole, including the erection of a permanent public memorial to her.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 May 2004: Standard registration
- MARY SEACOLE MEMORIAL STATUE APPEAL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor David Sterling | Chair | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charmaine Angela Case | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Pearson | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Felicia Kwaku OBE | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Winstanley | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Habib Naqvi | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Jean Dora Gray | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jermaine Daniel Sterling | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Charles Bates | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|||||
DAWN HILL CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.99k | £15.39k | £9.92k | £9.94k | £1.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.66k | £7.64k | £7.62k | £8.63k | £15.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02 FEB 2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16 APR 2004 AS AMENDED ON 02 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE, WOK AND ACHIEVEMENTS OF MARY SEACOLE (THE JAMAICAN BORN NURSE WHO NURSED SOLDIERS DURING THE CRIMEAN WAR AND WHO FOUGHT AGAINST RACISM AND INJUSTICE) INCLUDING, BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, THE ERECTION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PERMANENT PUBLIC MEMORIAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o Moore Barlow
Frameworks
2 Sheen Road
RICHMOND
Surrey
TW9 1AE
- Phone:
- 0208 334 0317
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window