GOATSGALORE ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer a home and a rehoming service to unwanted animals. To provide help and guidance to the general public in the care animals. To provide medical care and shelter to those animals in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN BEVERLEY ANN CHURCHILL | Chair |
|
||||||
Lawerance Yapp | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JILL ROLLO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONALD REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACK ROLLO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.22k | £8.63k | £9.21k | £17.30k | £17.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.21k | £8.62k | £9.21k | £16.79k | £13.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 26 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS BY: A) ESTABLISHING A SANCTUARY FOR THE CARE OF SUCH ANIMALS B) PROMOTING HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION AND TREATMENT. 2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE. 3. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS BY OFFERING FREE AND IMPARTIAL ADVICE AS AND WHEN REQUIRED. 4. OFFERING SHELTER OR SANCTUARY FOR ANIMALS, WHICH ARE IN NEED OF MEDICAL ATTENTION, PROVIDING MEDICAL TREATMENT FOR ANIMALS. 5. TO EDUCATE AND PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS THE CARE OF ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
goatsgalore
wicton lane
bromyard
bromyard
heefordshire
hr7 4lp
- Phone:
- 01885489050
- Email:
- rollo252@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window