Accounts and annual returns GILA LIMITED

Charity number: 1102786
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 05 February 2009 38 days late
Annual return 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2005 14 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 Not Required