Accounts and annual returns LOVE ALL CHILDREN ORPHANAGE

Charity Number: 1103924
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2019 15 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2018 10 January 2020 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2017 08 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2017 Not Required