Financial history EARTHBEAT LTD

Charity number: 1102705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £371.87k £320.22k £370.43k £430.32k £456.61k
Total expenditure £350.41k £332.15k £403.28k £393.27k £423.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £9.19k N/A N/A