Accounts and annual returns HILDA PARK FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1104735
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 09 February 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2019 05 February 2021 311 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 05 February 2021 311 days late