TENERIFE FAMILY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advance of the Christian faith and to relieve persons who are in conditions of need or hardship or who are aged or sick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Spain
Governance
- 07 April 2004: Standard registration
- Costa Del Silencio Christian Fellowship (Working name)
- SILENCIO - CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- COSTA DEL SILENCIO CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John R Banks | Chair | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Crone | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mr Bill Jeffrey | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Tom Greig | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Allan Wright | Trustee | 22 November 2004 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BANKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.34k | £79.18k | £63.32k | £117.12k | £147.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.52k | £73.81k | £62.71k | £66.41k | £74.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 November 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 November 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 October 2020 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 October 2020 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/11/2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN TENERIFE AND IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATIONS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE - IN PARTICULAR IN TENERIFE AND IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tenerife Family Church
Claudio Delgado Diaz 101
Las Chafiras
Santa Cruz de Tenerife
- Phone:
- +34606565528
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window