GLOBAL CHALLENGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Global Challenge helps communities engage youth, adults, and organizations to contribute to community development initiatives. We support and guide communities as they examine their history and resources, create a community vision and plan, and implement and sustain projects. General charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Algeria
- Angola
- Benin
- Botswana
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Djibouti
- Egypt
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Saint Helena
- São Tomé And Principe
- Senegal
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 11 June 2004: Standard registration
- SAAP THE SAA PROJECT (Working name)
- THE SOUTHERN AFRICA APLHA PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GODFREY MUGOTI | Chair | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Mugoti | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.50k | £500 | £550 | £550 | £600 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.40k | £450 | £500 | £500 | £550 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2024 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2024 | 694 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2024 | 1059 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED ON 28 MARCH 2004, 13 MAY 2004 AND 30 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK AND AFRICA BY PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE ACCOMMODATION AND SUBSISTENCE, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO FOOD AND CLOTHING. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK AND AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH FINANCIAL SUPPORT, AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION CONSIDER APPROPRIATE. 3. GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
THE UK AND AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BATTERSBEE WAY
LEICESTER
LE3 9LE
- Phone:
- 01162 247708
- Email:
- gchallenge@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window