WILLOW WILDLIFE AND ANIMAL SANCTUARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include the care of unwanted farm animals. The sanctuary is particularly beneficial to children and the disabled who are comforted by the love of the animals. We aim to teach the children to be gentle and caring. We also explain how to correctly handle the animals and how to recognise the need of medication.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 18 November 2004: Standard registration
- 20 February 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.45k | £9.59k | £7.39k | £5.35k | £1.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.28k | £10.08k | £7.81k | £6.66k | £5.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 FEBRUARY 2004 , AS AMENDED 8 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
THE RESCUE AND PROVISION OF CARE AND SHELTER FOR FARM ANIMALS AND WILD ANIMALS (INCLUDING BIRDS) IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF THEM BEING INJURED, MALTREATED, NEGLECTED, STRAY, UNWANTED OR ABANDONED AND IF POSSIBLE, WHERE APPROPRIATE TO FIND ALTERNATIVE HOME/CARER OR RELEASE BACK TO THE WILD IN THE CASE OF WILD ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window