THE ROBBIE KEAST TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HAMPSHIRE RUGBY CLUB AND LOCAL SPORTS/RECREATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 30 March 2004: Standard registration
- 24 July 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 14TH JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
1. THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT. 2. WITHOUT DETRACTING FROM THE GENERAL NATURE OF THE CHARITABLE TRUST THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER:- 2.1 THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF ENGINEERING AND FLUID MECHANICS AT WARWICK UNIVERSITY. 2.2 ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS IN HAMPSHIRE TO PLAY RUGBY UNION. 2.3 ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF GAMES OR SPORTS AT FAIR OAK SECONDARY SCHOOL, HAMPSHIRE.
Area of benefit
WARWICK UNIVERSITY, SCHOOLS IN HAMPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window