FRIENDS OF PETERSFIELD PHYSIC GARDEN

Charity number: 1105681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity runs and maintains the Physic Garden in Petersfield, Hampshire.The charity is run by volunteers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,628
Total expenditure: £16,196

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 September 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LEWIS THOMAS KENT Chair 23 June 2018
None on record
Beverley Ann Kent Trustee 23 July 2018
OAKLEY HOLIDAYS
Received: On time
Melanie Claire Oxley Trustee 23 June 2018
PETERSFIELD CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK (PECAN)
Received: On time
JOAN ANN SHEPLEY Trustee 23 June 2018
None on record
Jennifer Hill Trustee 03 June 2014
None on record
Rosemary Joy Clark Trustee 03 June 2014
None on record
COLIN HOWELL MATTINGLY Trustee
None on record
PAULINE MARY MATTHEWS Trustee
None on record
DAPHNE JANE CLARK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.77k £24.41k £9.17k £11.56k £10.63k
Total expenditure £13.55k £12.37k £18.74k £15.86k £16.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 December 2024 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 Monks Orchard
Petersfield
Hampshire
GU32 2JD
Phone:
01730269060